WI AB187 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 97.41 (4) (a) and 97.41 (4) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: micro market licensing fees. (FE)
Title
Micro market licensing fees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-08-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-30 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Snyder |
2019-05-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab187 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB187.pdf |