WI AB190 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 939.632 (1) (e) 3. and 941.23 (2) (intro.); and to create 939.6185, 941.23 (2d) and 941.2905 of the statutes; relating to: carrying a concealed weapon if prohibited from possessing a firearm, purchasing a firearm for a person who is prohibited from possessing a firearm, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Carrying a concealed weapon if prohibited from possessing a firearm, purchasing a firearm for a person who is prohibited from possessing a firearm, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-07-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-07-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-07-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-07-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-07-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-21 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-06-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab190 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB190.pdf |