WI AB191 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 301.295 of the statutes; Relating to: the use of billboards to recruit Department of Corrections employees. (FE)
Title
The use of billboards to recruit Department of Corrections employees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-19 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2019-06-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab191 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB191.pdf |