WI AB196 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 115.436 (2) (c); to renumber and amend 115.436 (2) (a) and 115.436 (3) (a); to amend 115.436 (2) (intro.) and 115.436 (3) (am); and to create 115.436 (2) (bm) and 115.436 (3) (a) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: school district sparsity aid and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
School district sparsity aid and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-01 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-04-29 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab196 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB196.pdf |