WI AB197 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 343.61 (4) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: driver school offices in private residences.
Title
Driver school offices in private residences.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] |
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Published 2-6-2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-5-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 89 |
2020-02-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2020 |
2020-01-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-24-2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-09-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-08-14 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2019-08-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-05-06 | House | Introduced |