WI AB20 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: terminology changes for those with an intellectual disability in administrative rules.
Title
Terminology changes for those with an intellectual disability in administrative rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-08 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on calendar 4-9-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-04-03 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-03-27 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2019-03-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-12 | House | Representative Crowley added as a coauthor |
2019-03-05 | House | Representative Zimmerman added as a coauthor |
2019-02-22 | House | Representatives Zamarripa and Felzkowski added as coauthors |
2019-02-15 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2019-02-12 | House | Representatives Ohnstad and Shankland added as coauthors |
2019-02-11 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab20 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB20.pdf |