WI AB203 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-11)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-11)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 6.15 (6) and 6.21; to renumber and amend 5.84 (1); to amend 5.85 (2) (a), 6.84 (2), 6.86 (1) (ar), 6.88 (3) (b), 6.92 (1), 6.925, 6.94, 6.95, 7.50 (2) (em) and 7.52 (3) (b); and to create 5.84 (1) (b), 6.91 and subchapter VI of chapter 6 [precedes 6.981] of the statutes; Relating to: using an electronic voting machine to cast a vote with an in-person absentee ballot and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Using an electronic voting machine to cast a vote with an in-person absentee ballot and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Hebl, Hesselbein, Subeck, Pope, Billings, Ohnstad, Doyle, Brostoff and Zamarripa |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:02 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Brandtjen |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2019-06-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Brandtjen |
2019-06-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brandtjen |
2019-05-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2019-05-10 | House | Introduced |