WI AB210 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 299.85 (2) (b), 299.85 (2) (bm) and 299.85 (3m); to amend 299.85 (2m), 299.85 (3) (intro.), 299.85 (3) (d), 299.85 (3) (e), 299.85 (3) (em), 299.85 (7) (a) 1., 299.85 (7) (a) 2. and 299.85 (9m) (d); and to create 299.85 (8) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: time limits for correcting violations found by the environmental compliance audit program.
Title
Time limits for correcting violations found by the environmental compliance audit program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2020-01-28 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-08-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2019-05-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab210 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB210.pdf |