WI AB230 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Swearingen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 36.31 (4) and 38.12 (7) (b); and to create 36.31 (4) (bm) and 38.12 (7) (b) 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: transferring academic credits from military transcripts to University of Wisconsin System schools and technical colleges. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transferring academic credits from military transcripts to University of Wisconsin System schools and technical colleges. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Swearingen
2020-01-31HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-01-31HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2020-01-30HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-30HouseRepresentative Wittke added as a coauthor
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Edming added as a coauthor
2020-01-23HousePublic hearing held
2019-05-30HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-05-23HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-05-22HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
2019-05-22HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback