WI AB237 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.445 (1) (b), 106.27 (2g) (a) 2. and 106.27 (3); and to create 106.27 (1y) of the statutes; Relating to: reimbursement grants to employers for payment of costs for certification programs in solar energy and wind energy systems. (FE)
Title
Reimbursement grants to employers for payment of costs for certification programs in solar energy and wind energy systems. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:03 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 12, Noes 2 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 13, Noes 1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-04 | House | Representative Fields added as a coauthor |
2019-12-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kuglitsch |
2019-11-07 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2019-11-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2019-05-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab237 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB237.pdf |