WI AB251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Published 7-4-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Published 7-4-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 77.51 (13b); to renumber and amend 73.03 (71) (a), 73.03 (71) (b), 73.03 (71) (c) and 73.03 (71) (d); to amend 66.0615 (1m) (f) 2., 77.51 (11d), 77.51 (13) (intro.), 77.51 (13) (a), 77.51 (13) (c), 77.982 (2), 77.991 (2) and 77.9951 (2); and to create 66.0615 (1m) (g), 73.03 (71) (a) 2., 73.03 (71) (b) 2., 73.03 (71) (c) 2., 73.03 (71) (d) 2., 77.51 (7i), 77.51 (7j), 77.51 (13) (p) 7., 77.51 (13) (q), 77.51 (14) (n) 7., 77.51 (17) (g), 77.52 (3m), 77.52 (14) (c), 77.523, 77.585 (1g) and 77.585 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring marketplace providers to collect and remit sales tax from third parties and reducing individual income tax rates based on the collection of sales and use tax from out-of-state retailers and marketplace providers. (FE)
Title
Requiring marketplace providers to collect and remit sales tax from third parties and reducing individual income tax rates based on the collection of sales and use tax from out-of-state retailers and marketplace providers. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | House | Published 7-4-2019 |
2019-07-03 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-3-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 10 |
2019-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-28-2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-28-2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2019-06-26 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-26-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vos |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vos |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-20 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 6-20-2019 |
2019-06-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vos |
2019-06-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rodriguez |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Report passage as amended, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s. 16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2019-06-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2019-06-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2019-06-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2019-06-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2019-06-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2019-06-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2019-06-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2019-06-11 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2019-06-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives McGuire, Riemer, Ohnstad and Haywood |
2019-06-07 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rodriguez |
2019-06-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-31 | House | Introduced |