WI AB256 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 32.19 (4m) (a) (intro.) and 32.19 (4m) (b) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: limiting condemnation payments made by a county or a redevelopment or community development authority. (FE)
Title
Limiting condemnation payments made by a county or a redevelopment or community development authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-11-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-10-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2019-06-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-06-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab256 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB256.pdf |