WI AB257 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 973.20 (2); and to create 40.08 (1t) and 973.20 (2) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: withholding from a Wisconsin Retirement System lump sum payment or annuity to satisfy an order of restitution.
Title
Withholding from a Wisconsin Retirement System lump sum payment or annuity to satisfy an order of restitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-19 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2019-06-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-06-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab257 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB257.pdf |