WI AB293 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 137.01 (1) and 137.01 (9); to amend subchapter I (title) of chapter 137 [precedes 137.01], 137.01 (2), 137.01 (3) (a), 137.01 (4) (a), 137.01 (4) (b), 137.01 (6) (a), 137.01 (6m), 137.01 (7), subchapter II (title) of chapter 137 [precedes 137.11], 137.11 (8), 137.19, 179.14 (1g) (b), 180.0103 (7k), 181.0103 (10p), 183.0107 (1g) (b), 193.005 (11p), 610.60 (4) (e), 706.001 (1), 706.25 (1) (d), 706.25 (2) (c) and 801.18 (1) (f); and to create 137.01 (1c), 137.01 (2m), 137.01 (3) (c), 137.01 (9) (bm), 137.01 (10), 137.01 (11), 137.01 (12), 137.01 (13), 137.195, 706.001 (2m) and 706.07 (8m) of the statutes; Relating to: online notaries public and electronic notarizations, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Online notaries public and electronic notarizations, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HousePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 125
2020-02-28HousePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-19SenateSenator Larson added as a cosponsor
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-14SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2019-11-12SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-11-12HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-12HouseRead a third time and passed
2019-11-12HouseRules suspended
2019-11-12HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-12HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2019-11-12HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2019-11-12HouseRead a second time
2019-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-11-04HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-11-04HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-11-04HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-11-04HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-10-29HouseExecutive action taken
2019-10-25HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg
2019-10-16HousePublic hearing held
2019-10-16HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg
2019-07-30HouseRepresentative Vruwink added as a coauthor
2019-07-02HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-13HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-06-13HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback