WI AB294 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.1105 (17) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: changing the 12 percent rule regarding the total value of taxable property included in the creation of a tax incremental financing district in the village of Ontario. (FE)
Title
Changing the 12 percent rule regarding the total value of taxable property included in the creation of a tax incremental financing district in the village of Ontario. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 2 |
2019-11-05 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg |
2019-10-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg |
2019-09-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab294 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB294.pdf |