WI AB298 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 173.41 (15) (b) 1. and 173.41 (15) (c); and to create 173.41 (9m) and 173.41 (15) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: sales of dogs and cats by pet stores and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Sales of dogs and cats by pet stores and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-13 | House | Representative Magnafici added as a coauthor |
2019-08-16 | House | Representative Crowley added as a coauthor |
2019-07-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-19 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor |
2019-06-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab298 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB298.pdf |