WI AB299 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 74.09 (3) (gb) of the statutes; Relating to: including with the property tax bill information state aid reduction to school districts. (FE)
Title
Including with the property tax bill information state aid reduction to school districts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-07-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-19 | House | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab299 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB299.pdf |