WI AB303 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 3.002 (2); to consolidate, renumber and amend 3.002 (intro.) and (1m); to amend 3.004 (2) and 5.15 (4) (a); to repeal and recreate subchapter I of chapter 4 [precedes 4.001]; and to create 13.49 of the statutes; Relating to: legislative and congressional redistricting. (FE)
Title
Legislative and congressional redistricting. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-22 | House | Representative Mursau added as a coauthor |
2019-10-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-15 | House | Representative Oldenburg added as a coauthor |
2019-07-03 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2019-06-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab303 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB303.pdf |