WI AB306 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.1105 (6) (c); and to create 66.1105 (6) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: tax increment value reporting errors and property tax reimbursement. (FE)
Title
Tax increment value reporting errors and property tax reimbursement. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-10-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-07-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab306 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB306.pdf |