WI AB309 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.056, 6.33 (2) (a), 6.35 (3), 6.86 (3) (c) and 85.61 (1); and to create 6.256, 6.29 (2) (e) and 343.14 (2p) of the statutes; Relating to: automatic voter registration and the integration of registration information with information maintained by the Department of Transportation and other state agencies and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Automatic voter registration and the integration of registration information with information maintained by the Department of Transportation and other state agencies and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2019-06-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab309 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB309.pdf |