WI AB31 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.115 (4) (fm) and 93.58 of the statutes; Relating to: grants for obtaining farm tractor rollover protection structures and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants for obtaining farm tractor rollover protection structures and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:01 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-15 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 24 (3)(a) |
2019-11-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kulp |
2019-11-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-10-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-29 | House | Representative Plumer added as a coauthor |
2019-05-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced |