WI AB322 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 758.20 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: the availability of information on crimes through the consolidated court automation programs.
Title
The availability of information on crimes through the consolidated court automation programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] | Rep. Rick Gundrum [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] |
Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] |
Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 4 |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-07-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-07-16 | House | LRB correction |
2019-06-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab322 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB322.pdf |