WI AB327 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to consolidate, renumber and amend 867.046 (2) (intro.), (a) and (b); and to amend 867.045 (1) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: obtaining evidence of the termination of certain property interests of a decedent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Obtaining evidence of the termination of certain property interests of a decedent.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HousePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 127
2020-02-28HousePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-14SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-01-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-01-21HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-01-21HouseRules suspended
2020-01-21HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-01-21HouseRead a second time
2020-01-16HousePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-01-15HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg
2019-12-26HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-12-26HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-10-29HouseExecutive action taken
2019-10-16HousePublic hearing held
2019-07-15HouseRepresentative Pronschinske added as a coauthor
2019-07-03HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-07-03HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback