WI AB328 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 234.907 (1) (d), 234.907 (1) (f), 234.907 (2) (cm) and 234.907 (2) (f); and to create 234.907 (2) (L) and 234.907 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: agricultural development loan guarantee program administered by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority. (FE)
Title
Agricultural development loan guarantee program administered by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-11-04 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tauchen |
2019-10-03 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2019-09-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-07-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy |
2019-07-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab328 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB328.pdf |