WI AB344 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 76.81; and to create 76.80 (2), (2m) and (5) of the statutes; Relating to: telephone company tax exemption for property used to provide broadband service. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telephone company tax exemption for property used to provide broadband service. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HousePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 128
2020-02-28HousePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateSenate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-19SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Smith, Johnson, L. Taylor, Hansen, Wirch, Shilling, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Erpenbach, Carpenter, Larson and Schachtner
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-14SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-12SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-11HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-11HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-02-11HouseRules suspended
2020-02-11HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-11HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-11HouseAssembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-11HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 36
2020-02-11HouseRead a second time
2020-02-05HouseAssembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Quinn
2019-11-12HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Doyle, Hintz, Hesselbein, Considine, Gruszynski, Hebl, B. Meyers, Milroy, Pope, Shankland, Stuck and Vruwink
2019-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-11-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-11-06HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 8, Noes 4
2019-11-06HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 8, Noes 4
2019-10-31HouseExecutive action taken
2019-10-29HouseReferred to joint committee on Finance
2019-10-29HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Rural Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2019-10-29HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Rural Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2019-09-19HouseExecutive action taken
2019-09-03HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Quinn
2019-08-27HouseSenator Cowles added as a cosponsor
2019-08-09HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-08-08HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-07-24HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development
2019-07-24HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback