WI AB345 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.491 of the statutes; Relating to: immunity for motor vehicle sellers.
Title
Immunity for motor vehicle sellers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-24 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2019-10-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-07-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2019-07-24 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab345 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB345.pdf |