WI AB35 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 943.10 (1m) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: entering certain places with intent to commit battery and providing a penalty.
Title
Entering certain places with intent to commit battery and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab35 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB35.pdf |