WI AB354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.435 (1) (ck) and 250.04 (15) of the statutes; Relating to: providing grants for the purchase of choking rescue devices and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Providing grants for the purchase of choking rescue devices and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Travis Tranel [R] | Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] | Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-09 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-07-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-07-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab354 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB354.pdf |