WI AB358 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 175.405; to amend 165.77 (title); and to create 165.77 (1) (bf) and (bm) and 165.77 (7g) of the statutes; Relating to: tracking of sexual assault kits in sexual assault cases and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Tracking of sexual assault kits in sexual assault cases and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-20 | House | Representatives Plumer and Emerson added as coauthors |
2019-08-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-08-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab358 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB358.pdf |