WI AB361 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 36.11 (47) (a), 36.11 (47) (b), 38.12 (13) (a), 38.12 (13) (b) and 39.48 (2); to amend 36.11 (47) (intro.), 36.27 (2) (br) 2., 38.12 (13) (intro.), 39.48 (intro.) and 39.48 (1); and to create 36.11 (47) (d), 38.12 (13) (d), 39.48 (2m) (intro.) and (a) and 39.48 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: requirements for colleges when service member students are called into active duty. (FE)
Title
Requirements for colleges when service member students are called into active duty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-02 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2019-09-17 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2019-09-13 | House | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor |
2019-09-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-09 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-08-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2019-08-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab361 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB361.pdf |