WI AB370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 18.01 (4) (intro.), 19.32 (2) and 36.09 (1) (f); to amend 18.05 (2), 18.05 (3), 18.06 (8) (am) 2., 18.10 (1), 18.10 (8), 18.10 (9), 18.14 (title), 36.115 (1) and 36.17 (1); and to create 18.01 (4) (bm), 18.11, 19.32 (2) (c), 19.42 (10) (t), 19.42 (13) (q), 36.09 (1) (f) 1. a., 36.09 (1) (f) 1. b., 36.09 (1) (f) 2., 36.09 (3) (c), 36.11 (59) and 36.115 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: state debt guaranties; delegations by the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System; organizations affiliated with the UW System; and standards of conduct for certain UW System employees. (FE)
Title
State debt guaranties; delegations by the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System; organizations affiliated with the UW System; and standards of conduct for certain UW System employees. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 5, Noes 4 |
2019-12-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-09 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-09-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-03 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2019-08-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2019-08-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab370 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB370.pdf |