WI AB378 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 118.07 (5); and to create 118.07 (5) (b), 118.47 and 121.02 (1) (L) 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: teen dating violence prevention education. (FE)
Title
Teen dating violence prevention education. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-30 | House | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor |
2019-09-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-08-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab378 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB378.pdf |