WI AB38 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 36.11 (55), 946.13 (12) (b) 2. and 946.13 (12) (c); to renumber and amend 946.13 (12) (a); to consolidate, renumber and amend 946.13 (12) (b) (intro.) and 1.; and to create 946.13 (12) (a) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: University of Wisconsin research contracts. (FE)
Title
University of Wisconsin research contracts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Published 11-22-2019 |
2019-11-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-21-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 36 |
2019-11-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-11-14 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-14-2019 |
2019-11-12 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-12 | House | Senate Amendment 1 concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-06-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-04-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced |