WI AB380 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 323.30; to amend 323.13 (1) (c) and 323.13 (2) (h); and to create 323.26, 323.27 and 323.30 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: federal emergency management assistance payments to municipalities. (FE)
Title
Federal emergency management assistance payments to municipalities. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kurtz |
2019-10-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz |
2019-09-19 | House | Representative Oldenburg added as a coauthor |
2019-08-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations |
2019-08-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab380 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB380.pdf |