WI AB382 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 168.105 of the statutes; Relating to: requirements for devices that dispense gasoline-ethanol fuel blends.
Title
Requirements for devices that dispense gasoline-ethanol fuel blends.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-28 | House | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor |
2019-10-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke |
2019-08-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2019-08-28 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab382 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB382.pdf |