WI AB395 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.835 (2) (bc), 20.835 (2) (bd), 20.835 (2) (be), 20.835 (2) (bL), 20.835 (2) (bm), 20.835 (2) (bn), 20.835 (2) (bp), 20.835 (2) (en), 20.855 (4) (co), 41.155, 71.07 (3p), 71.07 (3r), 71.07 (3rm), 71.07 (3rn), 71.07 (5f), 71.07 (5h), 71.07 (8r), 71.10 (7e) (c) 2., 71.28 (3p), 71.28 (3r), 71.28 (3rm), 71.28 (3rn), 71.28 (5f), 71.28 (5h), 71.28 (8r), 71.47 (3p), 71.47 (3r), 71.47 (3rm), 71.47 (3rn), 71.47 (5f), 71.47 (5h), 71.47 (8r), 93.53, 93.535, 93.54, 93.545 and 93.547; to renumber 71.10 (7e) (c) 1.; and to amend 71.05 (6) (a) 15., 71.05 (6) (b) 47. b., 71.08 (1) (intro.), 71.10 (4) (i), 71.21 (4) (a), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.30 (3) (f), 71.34 (1k) (g), 71.45 (2) (a) 10. and 71.49 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: repealing obsolete refundable tax credits.
Title
Repealing obsolete refundable tax credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-12 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-09-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab395 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB395.pdf |