WI AB414 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.563 (6m) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: the fee for a first-time annual fishing license for residents who are 16 or 17 years old or who are 65 years old or older. (FE)
Title
The fee for a first-time annual fishing license for residents who are 16 or 17 years old or who are 65 years old or older. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:07 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 11, Noes 3 |
2019-11-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-24 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2019-10-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-09 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-09-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage |
2019-09-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab414 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB414.pdf |