WI AB434 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 102.03 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: worker's compensation claims by certain public safety employees for post-traumatic stress disorder. (FE)
Title
Worker's compensation claims by certain public safety employees for post-traumatic stress disorder. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-13 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2017-11-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-08-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-08-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-07-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2017-07-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab434 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB434.pdf |