WI AB435 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 101.82 (1) and 145.02 (2) (b); and to create 101.053 of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of recreational and educational camps, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of recreational and educational camps, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HousePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 130
2020-02-28HousePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-25HouseLRB correction
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-14SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-27SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-27SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-01-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-01-21HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-01-21HouseRules suspended
2020-01-21HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21HouseRead a second time
2020-01-16HousePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-01-16HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-01-16HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Rural Development, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2020-01-14HouseExecutive action taken
2019-11-25HouseRepresentative C. Taylor added as a coauthor
2019-10-30HousePublic hearing held
2019-09-23HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-09-12HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development
2019-09-12HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback