WI AB442 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.255 (2) (bp) and 118.50 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: a whole grade sharing categorical aid for school boards and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A whole grade sharing categorical aid for school boards and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2020-01-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-10-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Felzkowski |
2019-10-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-03 | House | Representatives Ramthun and Jagler added as coauthors |
2019-10-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-13 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-09-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-09-13 | House | Introduced |