WI AB443 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: grant to a hospital for expanding psychiatric bed capacity. (FE)
Title
Grant to a hospital for expanding psychiatric bed capacity. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - Assembly: Ordered immediately messaged (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative James |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2020-01-31 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative James |
2019-10-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-03 | House | Representative Felzkowski added as a coauthor |
2019-09-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-09-13 | House | Introduced |