WI AB446 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend chapter 77 (title); and to create 20.455 (5) (hv) and subchapter XIII of chapter 77 [precedes 77.997] of the statutes; Relating to: imposing a tax on firearm manufacturers and services provided to victims of crimes involving firearms, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Imposing a tax on firearm manufacturers and services provided to victims of crimes involving firearms, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-30 | House | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor |
2019-09-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-09-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab446 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB446.pdf |