WI AB462 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 51.61 (2); and to create 51.61 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: right to specific staffing arrangements for certain patients in an intensive treatment program. (FE)
Title
Right to specific staffing arrangements for certain patients in an intensive treatment program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton |
2019-10-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-09-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab462 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB462.pdf |