WI AB465 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 121.004 (7) (c) 1. a., 121.004 (7) (c) 2. and 121.004 (7) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: counting pupils enrolled in four-year-old kindergarten. (FE)
Title
Counting pupils enrolled in four-year-old kindergarten. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Representative Tusler withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-10-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-09-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab465 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB465.pdf |