WI AB472 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0602 (3) (h) 1., 66.0602 (3) (h) 2. a. and 66.0602 (3) (h) 2. b. of the statutes; Relating to: an exception from local levy limits for certain amounts levied for charges assessed by a joint emergency medical services department. (FE)
Title
An exception from local levy limits for certain amounts levied for charges assessed by a joint emergency medical services department. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] |
Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 133 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-10 | House | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | House | Placed on calendar 10-10-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-10-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-10-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Loudenbeck and Mursau |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-02 | House | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor |
2019-10-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-26 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2019-09-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-09-24 | House | Introduced |