WI AB487 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 455.01 (4), 455.01 (7), 455.02 (2m) (h), 455.02 (3m) (title), 455.045 (2), 455.065 (3), 455.07, 455.08 and 455.10; to renumber and amend 455.02 (1m) and 455.02 (3m); to amend 15.405 (10m), 48.375 (2) (c), 48.375 (4) (b) 1m., 49.45 (30f), 50.06 (4), 50.94 (8), 51.30 (1) (b), 54.01 (27), 155.05 (2), 440.08 (2) (a) (intro.), 440.88 (3m), 455.01 (3m), 455.02 (1m) (title), 455.02 (2m) (d), 455.02 (2m) (m), 455.03, 455.04 (title), 455.04 (1) (intro.), 455.04 (1) (b), 455.04 (1) (c), 455.04 (1) (e), 455.04 (3), 455.04 (5), 455.045 (1), 455.065 (1), 455.065 (4), 455.065 (5), 455.09 (1) (intro.), 455.09 (1) (b), 455.09 (1) (g), 455.09 (3) and 905.04 (1) (e); to repeal and recreate 455.01 (5), 455.01 (6), 455.02 (2m) (f), 455.02 (2m) (k), 455.04 (1) (d), 455.04 (4), 455.045 (3), 455.06 and 455.09 (title); and to create 455.02 (2m) (o) to (s), 455.025, 455.04 (1) (dm), 455.04 (2), 455.065 (6) and (7), 455.09 (1) (i), 455.09 (1) (j), 455.09 (4) and 455.095 of the statutes; Relating to: the practice of psychology, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
The practice of psychology, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Tittl |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Vining |
2020-01-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Tittl |
2020-01-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2019-10-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-14 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2019-10-04 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2019-10-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-10-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab487 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB487.pdf |