WI AB490 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.0602 (3) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: changes to the local levy limit calculation for a political subdivision that transfers responsibility to provide a governmental service to another governmental unit. (FE)
Title
Changes to the local levy limit calculation for a political subdivision that transfers responsibility to provide a governmental service to another governmental unit. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 64, Noes 35 |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-14 | House | Senator Petrowski withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-08 | House | Senator Miller withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-01-08 | House | Representatives Ohnstad and Subeck withdrawn as coauthors |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2019-12-13 | House | Representative Anderson withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-12-13 | House | Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor |
2019-12-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-12 | House | Representative Hesselbein withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-12-11 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2019-10-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-10-01 | House | Introduced |