WI AB498 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0627 (8) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: loans and repayment assistance by a political subdivision for certain improvements to properties and collection of the debt by special charge.
Title
Loans and repayment assistance by a political subdivision for certain improvements to properties and collection of the debt by special charge.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Jason Fields [D] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] |
Rep. David Steffen [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Allen |
2019-12-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-12-12 | House | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-31 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2019-10-10 | House | Representative Gundrum added as a coauthor |
2019-10-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-10-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab498 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB498.pdf |