WI AB502 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.09 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: transfer of the authority to represent the public interest in proceedings under the Children's Code.
Title
Transfer of the authority to represent the public interest in proceedings under the Children's Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 134 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-10-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-10-07 | House | Introduced |