WI AB51 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 39.40 (1) (b), 39.40 (1) (d) and 39.40 (3) (b) 1.; and to create 39.40 (1) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: the minority teacher loan program. (FE)
Title
The minority teacher loan program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Published 11-22-2019 |
2019-11-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-21-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 35 |
2019-11-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-10-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bewley |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Representatives Ohnstad and Neubauer added as coauthors |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-06-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-05-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-03-28 | House | Representative Duchow added as a coauthor |
2019-03-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-27 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2019-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Loudenbeck and Fields |
2019-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced |